Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 13:43:16 (UTC).

Douglas L Miller vs. California State Senate a legislative branch of the State of California

Case Summary

On 10/10/2014 Douglas L Miller filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against California State Senate a legislative branch of the State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0071

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Douglas L.

Defendants

California State Senate a legislative branch of the State of California

Does 1-20

Obrien, Patricia

Phelan, Bob

Bob Phelan

Patricia O'Brien

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Alice Coleman

Defendant Attorney

Timothy G Yeung

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/27/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/27/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/27/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/27/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Declaration - Other (of Mary-Alice Coleman in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Mary-Alice Coleman in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.

Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/25/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/25/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Notice of Errata (to Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed.

Notice of Errata (to Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Sean Whalen) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Sean Whalen) filed. (Filed By: California State Senate a legislative branch of the State of California(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/17/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/17/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Opposition (Supplemental Memo in Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed.

Opposition (Supplemental Memo in Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Joe Jones in Support of Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Joe Jones in Support of Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Notice of Lodging (Non- California Authorities in Support of Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed.

Notice of Lodging (Non- California Authorities in Support of Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order on Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.

Order - Other (Order on Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:10 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:15 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • Bob Phelan added as a Defendant effective 01/23/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/27/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/14/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Miller, Douglas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy G. Yeung