Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/28/2019 at 15:48:37 (UTC).

Dorothy Takahashi vs. Emergency Medical Services Authority

Case Summary

On 12/18/2014 Dorothy Takahashi filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Emergency Medical Services Authority. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3055

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Takahashi, Dorothy

Defendants

Does 1-100

Emergency Medical Services Authority

Berkeley Land Company

B and Z Properties Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

Defendant Attorney

Douglas G. Wah

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 10/12/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 10/12/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/11/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/11/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 03/29/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 03/29/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 06/07/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 06/07/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/12/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/12/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/11/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/11/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Amended Complaint (Second) filed.

Amended Complaint (Second) filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 06/07/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 06/07/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: B and Z Properties Inc(Defendant))

Reply (Memo ISO Motion to Dismiss) filed.

Reply (Memo ISO Motion to Dismiss) filed. (Filed By: Emergency Medical Services Authority(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/16/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/16/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/23/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/23/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: B and Z Properties Inc(Defendant); Berkeley Land Company(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed.

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Berkeley Land Company(Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP scheduled for 09/27/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Berkeley Land Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • B and Z Properties Inc added as a Defendant effective 04/03/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Berkeley Land Company added as a Defendant effective 04/03/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES AGENCY A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAH DOUGLAS GARTH