This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/01/2017 at 08:21:47 (UTC).

DOLORES BELAND VS STEVEN STROUD. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2006 DOLORES BELAND filed an Other lawsuit against STEVEN STROUD. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4213

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beland, Dolores

Defendants

Town Hall Investors Inc

Security Pacific Financial Group Inc

Amerispec

Keller Williams Realty Fair Oaks

Security Pacific Real Estate

Stroud, Steven

Horn, Gini

Sunrise Pest Control Inc

Stroud, Kent

Hall, Shelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark T Gallagher

John C Miller, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Howard J Stagg, IV

Gerald J Beaudoin

John C Hentschel

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

CMP Packet

CMP Packet

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed. (Filed By: Hall, Shelly(Defendant); Security Pacific Financial Group Inc(Defendant); Security Pacific Real Estate(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Shelley Hall in support of motion for summary judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Shelley Hall in support of motion for summary judgment) filed. (Filed By: Hall, Shelly(Defendant); Security Pacific Financial Group Inc(Defendant); Security Pacific Real Estate(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address filed.

Notice of Change of Address filed. (Filed By: Hall, Shelly(Defendant); Security Pacific Real Estate(Defendant))

Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 07/21/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 07/21/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opposition to Security Pacific and Shelley Hall's MSJ/MSA) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opposition to Security Pacific and Shelley Hall's MSJ/MSA) filed. (Filed By: Beland, Dolores(Plaintiff))

Response (to separate statement of undisputed material facts in support of MSJ/MSA) filed.

Response (to separate statement of undisputed material facts in support of MSJ/MSA) filed. (Filed By: Beland, Dolores(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (William Thomas in support of opposition to Security Pacific and Shelley Hall's MSJ) filed.

Declaration - Other (William Thomas in support of opposition to Security Pacific and Shelley Hall's MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Beland, Dolores(Plaintiff))

Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of William Thomas and Motion to Strike Entire Declaration, or Paragraph 6 of the Thomas Declaration, as Irrelevant and Incompetent) filed.

Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of William Thomas and Motion to Strike Entire Declaration, or Paragraph 6 of the Thomas Declaration, as Irrelevant and Incompetent) filed. (Filed By: Hall, Shelly(Defendant); Security Pacific Financial Group Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Fulvio Picerno in support of Sunrise Pest Contro's motion to compel responses to form and special interrogatories etc) filed.

Declaration - Other (Fulvio Picerno in support of Sunrise Pest Contro's motion to compel responses to form and special interrogatories etc) filed. (Filed By: Sunrise Pest Control Inc(Defendant))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Stroud, Kent(Defendant); Stroud, Steven(Defendant))

Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel, 6/18/08, Dropped) filed.

Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel, 6/18/08, Dropped) filed. (Filed By: Sunrise Pest Control Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/18/2008 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/18/2008 02:00:00 PM .

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Stroud, Steven(Defendant))

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Beland, Dolores(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Beland, Dolores(Plaintiff))

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2007
  • Security Pacific Real Estate added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Amerispec added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Horn, Gini added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Sunrise Pest Control Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Stroud, Steven added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Stroud, Kent added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Hall, Shelly added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Security Pacific Financial Group Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Keller Williams Realty Fair Oaks added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Town Hall Investors Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/03/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less