Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 02:47:23 (UTC).

Diana Lee Balfour vs. Fair Oaks Fountains LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2010 Diana Lee Balfour filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fair Oaks Fountains LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2562

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Balfour, Diana Lee

Defendants

Gold River Mechanical

FPI Managment Inc

Gala Construction

Does 4-15

Fair Oaks Fountains LLC

Cross Defendants

Gold River Mechanical Inc

Gala Construction Inc

Roes 1-100

Roussos Construction Inc

Roes 1-200

Arbitrator

Meyers, Bernard H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark R Swartz

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Brett L McKague

John P Cotter

Karen L Jacobsen

Jeffrey S Behar

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/05/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/05/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/06/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/06/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: FPI Managment Inc(Cross - Complainant); Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

Summons (Cross Complaint) filed.

Summons (Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Roussos Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Roussos Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Stipulation and Order filed.

Stipulation and Order filed. (Filed By: Gold River Mechanical Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gold River Mechanical Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gala Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Roussos Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Hearing generated .

Notice of Hearing generated .

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/14/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar scheduled for 11/13/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/26/2012 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: FPI Managment Inc(Cross - Complainant); Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: FPI Managment Inc(Cross - Complainant); Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: FPI Managment Inc(Defendant); Fair Oaks Fountains LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/14/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Balfour, Diana(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold River Mechanical is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swartz, Esq., Mark R.