This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 07:30:12 (UTC).

Demari Singleton vs. Franklin Delano Gore

Case Summary

On 06/15/2015 Demari Singleton filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Franklin Delano Gore. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0532

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singleton, Demari

Defendants

Does 1-10

Gore, Franklin Delano

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons (Issued) filed.

Summons (Issued) filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Singleton, Demari Application for Waiver granted in full on 06/23/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (Issued) filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Singleton, Demari(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less