This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/10/2017 at 02:06:39 (UTC).

DeeAnn Silva vs. Richard Watts

Case Summary

On 10/12/2012 DeeAnn Silva filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Richard Watts. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3602

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bryer, Amanda

Olson, Jan

Torres, Elena

Silva, DeeAnn

Defendants

HV Houston Development Inc

Stanford Capital Inc

Stanford Hotels Corporation

Watts, Richard

Does 1 to 20

Stanford Capital Ventures Corporations

Interested Party

Doumit, Julie A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorney

William F Wright

Defendant Attorney

Kristina M Launey

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/11/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/11/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Dec of Elaine McElhinney) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Elaine McElhinney) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant))

Objection (to Evidence) filed.

Objection (to Evidence) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/11/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/11/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Stanford Hotels Corporation(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/08/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/08/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.

Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/03/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/03/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Dec of William F Wright) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of William F Wright) filed. (Filed By: Wright, William(Interested Party))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/16/2014 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/16/2014 02:00:00 PM .

Declaration - Other (Supplemental declaration of W Wright in support of plaintiffs Motion to compel depo of Elaine McElhinney and Tracey holloway) filed.

Declaration - Other (Supplemental declaration of W Wright in support of plaintiffs Motion to compel depo of Elaine McElhinney and Tracey holloway) filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed.

Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant); Stanford Hotels Corporation(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed.

Opposition (to Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant); Stanford Hotels Corporation(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Julie G Yap) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Application - Other (to further Extend Def's time to respond to plfs' complaint) filed. (Filed By: HV Houston Development Inc(Defendant); Watts, Richard(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Launey, Kristina M added as a effective 02/08/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/03/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bryer, Amanda(Plaintiff); Olson, Jan(Plaintiff); Silva, DeeAnn(Plaintiff); Torres, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less