This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:49:47 (UTC).

Dean Higgs vs. Plum Healthcare Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 Dean Higgs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Plum Healthcare Group, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6569

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aguilar, Dennis

Higgs, Dean

Defendants

Does 1-50

Oleander Holdings, LLC

Plum Healthcare Group, LLC

California OpCo LLC

Bay Bridge Captial Partners LLC

OpCo Holdings LLC

Flower Farm Group LLC

New Sisu Holdco LLC

Not Classified By Court

Bond, Cecily

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward P Dudensing

Defendant Attorney

William C Wilson

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/12/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/12/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/27/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/27/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/15/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/15/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO plfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from defs Regarding Certain Documents and Organizational Structure and Request for Production of Documents at Deposition) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO plfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from defs Regarding Certain Documents and Organizational Structure and Request for Production of Documents at Deposition) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Andrew J Collins ISO plfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from defs Regarding Certain Documents and Organizational Structure and Request for Production of Documents at Deposition) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Andrew J Collins ISO plfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from defs Regarding Certain Documents and Organizational Structure and Request for Production of Documents at Deposition) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Reply (in Support of Pltfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from Def Oleander Holdings LLC) filed.

Reply (in Support of Pltfs Motion to Compel the Person Most Qualified from Def Oleander Holdings LLC) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bay Bridge Captial Partners LLC(Defendant); California OpCo LLC(Defendant); Flower Farm Group LLC(Defendant); New Sisu Holdco LLC(Defendant); Oleander Holdings, LLC(Defendant); OpCo Holdings LLC(Defendant); Plum Healthcare Group, LLC(Defendant))

Order - Other (Order Granting Motion to Compel Chemire Williams to Appear for Deposition) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Motion to Compel Chemire Williams to Appear for Deposition) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Ronald G Pomares CPA ISO Motion to Compel the Deposition of Certain Individuals Affiliated with defs) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Ronald G Pomares CPA ISO Motion to Compel the Deposition of Certain Individuals Affiliated with defs) filed. (Filed By: Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of E Dudensing ISO Second Mtn to Compel Depo of Plum Healthcare) filed.

Declaration - Other (of E Dudensing ISO Second Mtn to Compel Depo of Plum Healthcare) filed. (Filed By: Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Plf Motion to Compel the Deepositions of Certain Individuals Affiliated with Def ;Request for Appointment of Discovery Referee) filed.

Opposition (to Plf Motion to Compel the Deepositions of Certain Individuals Affiliated with Def ;Request for Appointment of Discovery Referee) filed. (Filed By: Plum Healthcare Group, LLC(Defendant))

Opposition (to Plf Motion to Compel Def to Produce Documents Responsive to Plf request for Production of Documents Sets Four and Five; Request foor Appointment of Discovery Referee) filed.

Opposition (to Plf Motion to Compel Def to Produce Documents Responsive to Plf request for Production of Documents Sets Four and Five; Request foor Appointment of Discovery Referee) filed. (Filed By: Plum Healthcare Group, LLC(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/28/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/28/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/19/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/19/2018 02:00:00 PM .

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

Motion to Compel - Other (arbitration) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Oleander Holdings, LLC(Defendant); Plum Healthcare Group, LLC(Defendant))

Notice of Appeal and Election to Proceed Under Rule 8.124

Notice of Appeal and Election to Proceed Under Rule 8.124

262 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
343 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • Declaration - Other (in support of Motion for Preference) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion for Preference) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Preference filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/16/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/16/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/12/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Dennis(Plaintiff); Higgs, Dean(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less