This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:55:45 (UTC).

David Lynch vs. County of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 David Lynch filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2333

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynch, David

Defendants

County of Sacramento

Does 1-25

Comcast of Sacramento II LLC

A C Square Communications

AC Square Inc.

Cross Defendants

Silva, Emigdio

Moes 1-100

ROES 1-10

Zoes 1-100

ES7COMM-2U Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward A Schade

Defendant Attorneys

Carol A Wieckowski

Paul A Bigley

Julio A Hernandez

Cross Defendant Attorney

Christopher J Beeman

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: AC Square Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: ES7COMM-2U Inc(Cross - Complainant); Silva, Emigdio(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed.

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: ES7COMM-2U Inc(Cross - Complainant); Silva, Emigdio(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: ES7COMM-2U Inc(Cross - Complainant); Silva, Emigdio(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (on Cross-Complaint against AC Square Inc) filed.

Summons (on Cross-Complaint against AC Square Inc) filed. (Filed By: ES7COMM-2U Inc(Cross - Complainant); Silva, Emigdio(Cross - Complainant))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: ES7COMM-2U Inc(Cross - Complainant); Silva, Emigdio(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Confirming Letter - 5/21/19 hearing dropped from calendar) filed. (Filed By: Comcast of Sacramento II LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/21/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/21/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (First Amended) filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/29/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lynch, David(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less