This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 03:58:26 (UTC).

David Houdeshell vs. Premier Pools Inc

Case Summary

On 10/20/2009 David Houdeshell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Premier Pools Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1093

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Houdeshell, David

Houdeshell, Deborah

Defendants

Premier Pools Inc

Does 1-50

Cross Defendants

Rodriguez Brothers

Roes 1-100

Roes 1-50

Rodriguez Jr, Albert

Air Blown Concrete

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton M Anderson

Defendant Attorney

Paul R Cotter

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Julie McElroy

Elizabeth A Skane

Justin N Tierney, Jr

John W Herstead

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/16/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/16/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/17/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/17/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff))

Certificate of Service filed.

Certificate of Service filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint submitted by Premier Pools Inc rejected on 06/17/2010 .

Cross-Complaint submitted by Premier Pools Inc rejected on 06/17/2010 . (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Amendment to Cross-Complaint filed.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Air Blown Concrete(Cross - Defendant))

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketCross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • DocketRoes 1-50 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 12/18/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Premier Pools Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Houdeshell, David(Plaintiff); Houdeshell, Deborah(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/20/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Pools Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COTTER, PAUL R.