This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/10/2017 at 14:06:53 (UTC).

Dale Burns vs. Adam Frazier

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 Dale Burns filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Adam Frazier. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5263

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Burns, Dale

Defendants

State of California

Adam Frazier

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Franck

Defendant Attorneys

Andreas O Garza

Kamala Devi Harris

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/09/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/09/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 09/11/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 09/11/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets set on 10/30/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets set on 10/30/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/30/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/30/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/11/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/11/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Paper Exhibits (Evidence in Support of Motion) filed.

Paper Exhibits (Evidence in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer Marquez) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer Marquez) filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Objection (DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST) filed.

Objection (DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST) filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Objection (DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST) filed.

Objection (DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST) filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Timothy Riggs in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Timothy Riggs in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine) filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Witness List filed.

Witness List filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Questions for court to ask on voir dire requested by defendants

Questions for court to ask on voir dire requested by defendants

Witness List filed.

Witness List filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Juror Questions filed.

Juror Questions filed.

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 30; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Adam Frazier(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Burns, Dale Application for Waiver granted in full on 01/09/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Case Management) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/08/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Burns, Dale(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less