Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/07/2017 at 18:59:06 (UTC).

CRAIG & CHARLENE WILLIAMS. ET AL VS. THE FORECAST GROUP.ETAL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2003 CRAIG CHARLENE WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against THE FORECAST GROUP ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5702

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rios, Victor

Straub, Richard

Cooley, Leonard

Cooley, Cathy

Carlson, Roger W.

Yancy, Jan

Cartledge, Alan

Straub, Teresa

Defendants

Forecast Group LP

Atmos Corporation

Zimmerman Roofing

Cross Defendants

Tomajic, Paul

Kleary Masonry Inc

Sacramento A-1 Door

Dolan Building Materials Co Inc

GM Painting

DNT Enterprises

Yard Furnishers Inc

National Flooring Center

Wallace-Kuhl & Associates Inc

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Michael F Keddy

Christopher R Chapman

Daniel A Serot

Kelly L Lynch

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Ted D Wood

Jon A Van Woerkom

Russ J Wunderli

Michael W Thomas

Suzanne A Tollefson

William J Schmidt

Other Attorneys

Benjamin W Blaisdell

Grant C Woodruff

Patricia A Sisemore

Kevin P. McCarthy

James Han

Janis L Hulse

Darryl M Yee

Albert F Quintrall

Ralph E Laird

David M Levy

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/28/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 45 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Sanctions has been generated .

Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/28/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 45 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Sanctions has been generated .

Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice

Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2005
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2008
  • Rios, Oleta added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Richter, Terri L added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Pereira, Kristine M added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Gomez, Juan added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Cooley, Leonard added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Cooley, Cathy added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Cartledge, Tammy added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Cartledge, Alan added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Carlson, Roger W added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Carlson, Carolyn L added as a Plaintiff effective 10/06/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FLOORING CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kleary Masonry, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmerman Roofing is a litigant

Latest cases where Wallace-Kuhl & Associates, Inc is a litigant