Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/24/2017 at 13:20:58 (UTC).

County of Alameda vs. California Department of Parks and Recreation

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 County of Alameda filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Department of Parks and Recreation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2496

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Alameda

Respondents

California Department of Parks and Recreation Off-Highway Motor Vehicle Recreational Commission

Does 1 through 20

California Department of Parks and Recreation

California Department of Parks and Recreation Off-Highway Motor Vehicle Recreational Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Donna R Ziegler

Respondent Attorneys

Kamala Devi Harris

Danae J Aitchison

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Of Preparation of Record of Proceedings) filed.

Notice - Other (Of Preparation of Record of Proceedings) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Debby Krajewski) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Debby Krajewski) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (eric Lueder) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (eric Lueder) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (E. Theodore Cabral) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (E. Theodore Cabral) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Stipulation Only - Other filed.

Stipulation Only - Other filed. (Filed By: California Department of Parks and Recreation(Respondent); County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Order - Other (Order Relating Cases and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing) filed.

Order - Other (Order Relating Cases and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing) filed.

Order - Other (Minute Order re Peremptory Disqualification and Reassignment of Case) filed.

Order - Other (Minute Order re Peremptory Disqualification and Reassignment of Case) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Re: Admin Record) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Re: Admin Record) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Administrative Record) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Administrative Record) filed.

Amended Petition (1st Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Amended Petition (1st Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

Stipulation and Order - Other (Stip & (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time to Certify & Lodge Administrative Record) filed.

Stipulation and Order - Other (Stip & (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time to Certify & Lodge Administrative Record) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Parks and Recreation(Respondent))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Certify and Lodge Administrative Record) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Certify and Lodge Administrative Record) filed.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Certify and Lodge Administrative Record) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order - Other (Stip & (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time to Certify & Lodge Administrative Record) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Parks and Recreation(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Notice - Other (to Attorney General of CEQA 1st Amended Petition) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition (1st Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: California Department of Parks and Recreation Off-Highway Motor Vehicle Recreational Commission(Petitioner); California Department of Parks and Recreation Off-Highway Motor Vehicle Recreational Division(Respondent); California Department of Parks and Recreation(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Aitchison, Danae J added as a effective 03/20/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Administrative Record) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Re: Admin Record) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Debby Krajewski) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (to Attorney General of the State of California of CEQA Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Of Preparation of Record of Proceedings) filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: County of Alameda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Parks and Recreation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIEGLER, DONNA R.