Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 23:57:49 (UTC).

Corina Zamora vs. Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc

Case Summary

On 03/18/2014 Corina Zamora filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Elizabeth Huynh D D S Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0403

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMORA, CORINA

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ELIZABETH HUYNH D.D.S INC

Interested Party

State of California Employment Development Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julie A Doumit

William F Wright

Defendant Attorney

Arthur W. Curley

Interested Party Attorney

Kamala Devi Harris

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/11/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/11/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Julie A Doumit) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Julie A Doumit) filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) submitted by Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc rejected on 08/26/2014 .

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) submitted by Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc rejected on 08/26/2014 . (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Mike Pham) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Mike Pham) filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Ronni Huckabay in Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Documents Set One) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Ronni Huckabay in Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Documents Set One) filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to Motion) filed.

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to Motion) filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Compal Responses) filed.

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Compal Responses) filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue the Hearing on Motion - by Non-Party) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue the Hearing on Motion - by Non-Party) filed. (Filed By: State of California Employment Development Department(Interested Party))

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/12/2014 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/12/2014 02:00:00 PM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Quash Subpoena filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Elizabeth Huynh D.D.S Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Wright, William F added as a effective 06/12/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/11/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/19/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Zamora, Corina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS KAMALA D. ESQ.