Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 12:02:35 (UTC).

Cooper Engineering Inc vs. Road and Highway Builders of California Inc

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 Cooper Engineering Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Road and Highway Builders of California Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1054

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cooper Engineering Inc

Defendants

Department of Transportation

Does 1-100

Road and Highway Builders of California Inc

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America a Connecticut corporation

State of California Department of Transportation

Cross Defendant

Does 101-200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John A Gladych

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A Miller

Michael D Schoenfeld

Jidi Wong

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: State of California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

General Denial filed.

General Denial filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Defendant); Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America a Connecticut corporation(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (Cross Complaint) filed.

Summons (Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (To Cross-Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Defendant); Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America a Connecticut corporation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: State of California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: State of California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Road and Highway Builders of California Inc(Defendant); Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America a Connecticut corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2015
  • Wong, Jidi added as a effective 08/11/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/30/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cooper Engineering Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG, JIDI