This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/24/2017 at 18:52:22 (UTC).

Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc vs. George L Throop Company

Case Summary

On 12/27/2016 Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against George L Throop Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5477

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Concernede Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc

Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc

Defendants

George L Throop Company

Suretec Indemnity Company

Does 1 - 100

Cross Defendants

Roes 1-100

Troop, Jeffrey Lanphier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Domenic D Spinelli

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey R Hudson

John Logan Hunter

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

General Denial filed.

General Denial filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Defendant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Request - Court Judgment filed.

Request - Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: George L Throop Company(Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sacramento Inc to sSuretec Indemnity Co Motion of judgment on the pleadings) filed.

Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sacramento Inc to sSuretec Indemnity Co Motion of judgment on the pleadings) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Objection (to request for judcial notice) filed.

Objection (to request for judcial notice) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sac to Demurrer) filed.

Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sac to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: George L Throop Company(Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed. (Filed By: George L Throop Company(Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/03/2017 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/03/2017 02:00:00 PM .

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/03/2017 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/03/2017 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed. (Filed By: George L Throop Company(Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: George L Throop Company(Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sac to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection (to request for judcial notice) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition (of concerned taxpayers of Sacramento Inc to sSuretec Indemnity Co Motion of judgment on the pleadings) filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • Troop, Jeffrey Lanphier added as a Cross - Defendant effective 01/25/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • General Denial filed. (Filed By: Suretec Indemnity Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/28/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Concerned Taxpayers of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGE L. THROOP CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinelli, Domenic D.