This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 20:12:46 (UTC).

City of Sacramento v. Larry E. Bell

Case Summary

On 09/20/2006 City of Sacramento filed an Other lawsuit against Larry E Bell. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4002

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Sacramento

Defendants

Beacham, Eunice

Estate of Dorris Willis

Bell, Larry E.

Bell Sr, Randolphe Alvin

Bell, Charles

Estate of Samuel Bell Jr

Bell, Mary Rose

Bell, Warren

Bell, David

Bell, Bonnie Jean

Love, Thelma

Bell, Lionel

Cross Defendants

Does 1-24

Garber, Chad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A Fry

Eileen M Teichert

Defendant Attorney

Law Office of Greg K. Peterson

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other (of Michael A. Fry in support of City of Sacramen to's Motion to Quash Defendant Larry E. Bell's Subpoena) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Michael A. Fry in support of City of Sacramen to's Motion to Quash Defendant Larry E. Bell's Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Defendant Larry E. Bell's Civil Subpoena) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Defendant Larry E. Bell's Civil Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/06/2008 10:40:18 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/06/2008 10:40:18 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/07/2008 03:12:13 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/07/2008 03:12:13 PM .

Entry of Default re: Larry E. Bell

Entry of Default re: Larry E. Bell

Declaration - Other (Michael A Fry in support of motion for attorney's fees) filed.

Declaration - Other (Michael A Fry in support of motion for attorney's fees) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Notice of Hearing (Amended Notice of Hearing) filed.

Notice of Hearing (Amended Notice of Hearing) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff); Garber, Chad(Plaintiff))

Objection filed.

Objection filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Motion - Other (To Require Cross-Complainant) filed.

Motion - Other (To Require Cross-Complainant) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Michael A Fry in support of motion to require Larry Bell to post a security as vexatious litigant) filed.

Declaration - Other (Michael A Fry in support of motion to require Larry Bell to post a security as vexatious litigant) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal

Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal

Certificate of Service by Mailing (CJC/AOC)

Certificate of Service by Mailing (CJC/AOC)

Notice of Default (re: RT fees)

Notice of Default (re: RT fees)

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Bell, Larry(Cross - Complainant))

Estimated Costs of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

Estimated Costs of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

Receipt from Larry Bell for 1 volume Clerks Augmented Transcript C061738

Receipt from Larry Bell for 1 volume Clerks Augmented Transcript C061738

Abstract of Judgment submitted by City of Sacramento rejected on 10/07/2010 .

Abstract of Judgment submitted by City of Sacramento rejected on 10/07/2010 . (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion in Limine - Civil Trial; Department: 44; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Short Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Warren added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Estate of Samuel Bell Jr. added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Randolphe Alvin Sr added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Mary Rose added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Lionel added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Larry E. added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, David added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Charles added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Bell, Bonnie Jean added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • Beacham, Eunice added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less