This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 15:32:04 (UTC).

City of Anaheim vs. Ana J Matosantos, Director of State of California Department of Finance

Case Summary

On 06/14/2013 City of Anaheim filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Ana J Matosantos, Director of State of California Department of Finance. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1529

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ANAHEIM AS SUCCESSOR AGENCY TO THE DISSOLVED ANAHEIM REDEVELOPMENT AGENC

Petitioners

ANAHEIM HOUSING AUTHORITY

CITY OF ANAHEIM

Defendants

ANA J MATOSANTOS, DIRECTOR OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

OVERNIGHT BOARD OF THE CITY OF ANAHEIM SUCCESSOR AGENCY TO THE DISSOLVED ANAHEIM REDEVELOPMENT AGENC

Respondents

JAN E GRIMES, CHIEF DEPUTY AUDITOR

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE

Overnight Board of the City of Anaheim successor Agency to the Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency

Does 1 to 20

Interested Parties

North Orange County Community College District

Orange County Flood Control District

County of Orange

The Related Companies of California LLC

Yorba Linda Water District

Anaheim City School District

Orange County Transportation Authority

Orange County Sanitation District

Orange Unified School District

Orange County Water District

Roes 21-40

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeffrey M Oderman

Respondent Attorneys

Marianne Van Riper

Kamala Devi Harris

Interested Party Attorneys

Laurie A Shade

Eddy R Beltran

M Lois Bobak

Ann Levin

Other Attorneys

Steven B Quintanilla

 

Court Documents

City of Anaheim v. Matosantos - Order for Further Briefing

City of Anaheim v. Matosantos - Order for Further Briefing

City of Anaheim v. Matosantos - Writ

City of Anaheim v. Matosantos - Writ

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Anaheim Housing Authority(Petitioner); City of Anaheim as successor Agency to The Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: County of Orange(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)); Orange County Flood Control District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Jan E Grimes, Chief Deputy Auditor(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Yorba Linda Water District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Orange County Sanitation District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)); Orange County Sanitation District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Orange County Transportation Authority(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Stipulation and Order - Other (to Set Aside Default) filed.

Stipulation and Order - Other (to Set Aside Default) filed. (Filed By: Orange County Sanitation District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)); Orange County Transportation Authority(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Order - Other (Stipulation Re Compliance with Issued Writ of Mandate, Judgment, and/or Final Ruling By and Between Petitioners and Real Parties In Interest North Orange County Community College District and Placentia-Yorba Linda Unified School District; Order) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation Re Compliance with Issued Writ of Mandate, Judgment, and/or Final Ruling By and Between Petitioners and Real Parties In Interest North Orange County Community College District and Placentia-Yorba Linda Unified School District; Order) filed.

Proof of Service (Re: Briefing) filed.

Proof of Service (Re: Briefing) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of State of California Department of Finance(Respondent); State of California Department of Finance(Respondent))

Objection (to declaration of Frank Cardone and John Woodhead) filed.

Objection (to declaration of Frank Cardone and John Woodhead) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of State of California Department of Finance(Respondent); State of California Department of Finance(Respondent))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 12/18/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 12/18/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Supplemental - Other (Brief Regarding the Impact of the Appellate Decision) filed.

Supplemental - Other (Brief Regarding the Impact of the Appellate Decision) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of State of California Department of Finance(Respondent); State of California Department of Finance(Respondent); State of California Department of Finance(Respondent))

Proposed Order (Denyimg the Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Proposed Order (Denyimg the Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of State of California Department of Finance(Respondent); State of California Department of Finance(Respondent))

3DCA order augmenting record

3DCA order augmenting record

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 3DCA order augmenting record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 3DCA return receipt for RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of State of California Department of Finance(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: City of Anaheim as successor Agency to The Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2013
  • North Orange County Community College District added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Magnolia Elementary School District added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Centralia Elementary School District added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Anaheim Union High School District added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Anaheim City School District added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • County of Orange added as a Real Party In Interest (Rpii) effective 06/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Anaheim Housing Authority(Petitioner); City of Anaheim as successor Agency to The Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Anaheim Housing Authority(Petitioner); City of Anaheim as successor Agency to The Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate (And Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Anaheim Housing Authority(Petitioner); City of Anaheim as successor Agency to The Dissolved Anaheim Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); City of Anaheim(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.