Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/07/2017 at 15:30:22 (UTC).

CHRIS PEDERSEN. ET AL VS. JULIE C. BRAWN. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2003 CHRIS PEDERSEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JULIE C BRAWN. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5084

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pedersen, Kim

Pedersen, Chris

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Franklin, James L.

Brawn, Julie C.

Designer Patterns for Concrete Inc

All Phase Development Inc

Daysh Developments Inc

All Phase Enterprises LLC

Gold River Mechanical

Whitesides, Steve

Brandt, Michael

Capitol Concrete

Don Hoban Company Inc

Omega Tile Co Inc

Tropicana Pools of Sonoma

Strong Construction

McGuire Earthworks Inc

Finest Kind Plastering

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Designer Patterns for Concrete Inc

Daysh Developments Inc

All Phase Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan D Williams

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Joe R Abramson

Steven Benjamin

Robert M Bustamante

Eileen T Booth

Suzanne A Tollefson

Benjamin A Davies

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Benjamin

Robert M Bustamante

Eileen T Booth

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

CMP Packet

CMP Packet

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Daysh Developments Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: All Phase Development Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: All Phase Enterprises LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: All Phase Enterprises LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: All Phase Enterprises LLC(Cross - Defendant); Whitesides, Steve(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed. (Filed By: Designer Patterns for Concrete Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Dismissal entered as requested on 1/31/08

Dismissal entered as requested on 1/31/08

Returned Document Form - [Re: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof Of Service]

Returned Document Form - [Re: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof Of Service]

Clerk's Comment

Clerk's Comment

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2007
  • Franklin, James L. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • California Retaining Walls Company added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • M.W. Brandt ind/ dba M.W. Brandt General Engineering Contractors added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • All Phase Enterprises, LLC added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Whitesides, Steve added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • All Phase Development, Inc. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Daysh Developments Inc. dba California Retaining Walls Co. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Gold River Mechanical, Inc. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Designer Patterns for Concrete, Inc. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Brawn, Julie C. added as a Defendant effective 09/13/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omega Tile Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Gold River Mechanical is a litigant

Latest cases where Designer Patterns for Concrete Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where All Phase Development Inc is a litigant