This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 16:43:50 (UTC).

Chelsea Korner vs. Rebecca Grubbs

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 Chelsea Korner filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rebecca Grubbs. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2384

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Korner, Chelsea

Defendants

Armstrong, Susan Anne

Charles, Scott

Does 1-50

Grubbs, Hannah

Grubbs, Rebecca

Mercury Insurance Company

Trust, Berger V.

Senestraro, Jesse

Armstrong, Cyril James

Armstrong, Scott Charles

Cross Defendants

Moes 1-20

Roes 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard F Antoine

Defendant Attorneys

Julia V Islas

John P Hallissy

Gina Dashman Boer

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/11/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/11/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/08/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/08/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike (Portions of First Amended Complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Portions of First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Mercury Insurance Company(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Stipulation to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action) submitted by Korner, Chelsea rejected on 03/07/2016 .

Order - Other (Stipulation to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action) submitted by Korner, Chelsea rejected on 03/07/2016 . (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Armstrong, Scott(Defendant); Armstrong, Susan(Defendant))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action) filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Answer (Amended Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (Amended Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Senestraro, Jesse(Cross - Defendant))

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Armstrong, Scott(Cross - Defendant); Armstrong, Susan(Cross - Defendant))

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Join Uninsured Motorisst Claim) filed.

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Join Uninsured Motorisst Claim) filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 07/08/2016 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 07/08/2016 09:30:00 AM .

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 11) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 11) filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed. (Filed By: Armstrong, Cyril(Defendant); Armstrong, Scott(Defendant); Armstrong, Susan(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Richard F Antoine ISO Pltfs Consolidated Opp to Deft Senestraro MSJ and MSJ Filed Jointly on Behalf of Armstrong Defts) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Richard F Antoine ISO Pltfs Consolidated Opp to Deft Senestraro MSJ and MSJ Filed Jointly on Behalf of Armstrong Defts) filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.

Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 04/10/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 04/10/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection (to Pltf's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts) filed. (Filed By: Senestraro, Jesse(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (Re: Senestraro's Objections to Evidence) filed. (Filed By: Senestraro, Jesse(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Senestraro, Jesse added as a Defendant effective 09/18/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/30/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Korner, Chelsea(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less