This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 05:51:29 (UTC).

Carolyne Swayze vs. Stephen Frei

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 Carolyne Swayze filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Stephen Frei. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4147

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Swayze, Carolyne

Defendants

Campus Commons Park Corporation

Does 1-50

Frei, Stephen

Garcia, Jeanne

Hullander, Edwin

Luebbermann, Barbara

Meade, Michael M.

Rodieck, Richard

Wilder, William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carolyne Swayze

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Levangie

Carl L Fessenden

Michael M Meade

Caridad Pena-Colon

Derek J Haynes

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Wilder, William(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Campus Commons Park Corporation(Defendant); Hullander, Edwin(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Edwin Hullander) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Edwin Hullander) filed. (Filed By: Campus Commons Park Corporation(Defendant); Hullander, Edwin(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Denying Deft's Motion to Strike Allegations) filed.

Proposed Order (Denying Deft's Motion to Strike Allegations) filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Rodieck, Richard(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Michael Meade in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Michael Meade in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: Frei, Stephen(Defendant); Garcia, Jeanne(Defendant); Luebbermann, Barbara(Defendant); Meade, Michael(Defendant); Rodieck, Richard(Defendant); Wilder, William(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of William Wilder in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of William Wilder in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: Frei, Stephen(Defendant); Garcia, Jeanne(Defendant); Luebbermann, Barbara(Defendant); Meade, Michael(Defendant); Rodieck, Richard(Defendant); Wilder, William(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Pltf Carolyn Swayze in Opposition to Special Motion to Strike) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Pltf Carolyn Swayze in Opposition to Special Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Motion to Strike) filed.

Opposition (to Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Jeanne(Defendant))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 01/26/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 01/26/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/28/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/28/2016 02:00:00 PM .

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/28/2016 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 01/26/2016 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal of 1/26/16 hearing) filed. (Filed By: Frei, Stephen(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/14/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Swayze, Carolyne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less