Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/06/2017 at 21:23:55 (UTC).

CAROL CARKINS. ET AL VS. WILLIAM LYON HOMES. INC.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2003 CAROL CARKINS filed an Other lawsuit against WILLIAM LYON HOMES INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2896

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carkins, Carol

Cross, Teresa

Dearth, Cindy

Savala, Serafin

Bayona, Adrianna M.

Defendant

SDC Construction

Cross Defendants

Sacramento A 1 Door

Davis Roofing Corporation

Genesis Tile

DMC Construction

Perverini Tile

Sommerkal Construction Inc

Creative Design Interiors

Northern California Inland Materials Inc

Cache Creek Landscape

Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc

RCI Electric

Kenyon Construction Inc

Abri Developments

Dougherty, Paul A.

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Richard C. Creeggan

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Amanda R Lowe

Paul D Fife

SUI LA

Chad T Thomas

Amanda J McKechnie

Steven C Lynes

Bob Sims

Ruthie D Wynne

Other Attorneys

David N Poll

Jon A Van Woerkom

Darryl M Yee

Michael S Ellis

Elizabeth W Lawley

Patricia A Sisemore

Daniel M Steinberg

G Geoffrey Wood

Randi L Fujimoto

David L Strong

Kathleen Quinlen Brown

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice

Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program set on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program heard on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program heard on 05/08/2008 08:30:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2008
  • Beard, Tyrone L added as a Plaintiff effective 05/22/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Bayona, Adrianna M added as a Plaintiff effective 05/22/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • The Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program is scheduled for 05/08/2008 at 08:30 AM in Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/08/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Failure to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 03/20/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • Case Notes generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/20/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Sanctions has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sacramento A 1 Door is a litigant

Latest cases where Sommerkal Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where RCI Electric Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Kenyon Construction Inc A Ca Corp is a litigant