This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/25/2019 at 23:44:35 (UTC).

Calvin Chang vs. Benjamin Kaufman, M.D.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2015 Calvin Chang filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Benjamin Kaufman, M D. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7958

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chang, Calvin

Defendants

Does 1-100

Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony N Luti

Defendant Attorney

Barry Vogel

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Application - Other (Order to Seal Decs with Exhibits) filed.

Application - Other (Order to Seal Decs with Exhibits) filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Calvin Chang in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike the Pleadings in Plaintiff's Complaint) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Calvin Chang in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike the Pleadings in Plaintiff's Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Objection (to Evidence) filed.

Objection (to Evidence) filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 08/10/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 08/10/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/02/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/02/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Application - Other (for Order to Seal Declarations with Exhibits Filed in SLAPP Motion) filed.

Application - Other (for Order to Seal Declarations with Exhibits Filed in SLAPP Motion) filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Amended App to Seal Declaration with Exhibits) filed.

Opposition (to Amended App to Seal Declaration with Exhibits) filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs) filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth Handelin in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth Handelin in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs) filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Application for Order Sealing Record - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Application for Order Sealing Record - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike (SLAPP) - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Kaufman, M.D., Benjamin(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/16/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Chang, Calvin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less