This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 19:56:25 (UTC).

Belma Peace vs. Sutter Medical Center Sacramento

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 Belma Peace filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Sutter Medical Center Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6630

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peace, Belma

Peace, Charles Frederick

The Estate of Frederick Peace

Defendants

Bijan Bijan MD

Bradley W. Schroeder MD

Bruce L Gordon MD

Daniel P Ikeda MD

Does 1-75

George T Harris MD

Oluyemi O Odunusi MD

Ose Adams Medical Pavilion

Subramaniam Krishnan MD

Sutter Health

Sutter Medical Center Sacramento

Sutter Medical Group

Sutter Memorial Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonita Pineda Martinez

Defendant Attorney

Robert H Zimmerman

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/23/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/23/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Non Service filed.

Declaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed.

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bijan Bijan MD(Defendant); Subramaniam Krishnan MD(Defendant); Sutter Medical Group(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Ian A Scharg in Support of Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Ian A Scharg in Support of Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Bijan Bijan MD(Defendant); Subramaniam Krishnan MD(Defendant); Sutter Medical Group(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff))

Motion to Compel - Other (pllfs' discovery responses) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (pllfs' discovery responses) filed. (Filed By: Sutter Health(Defendant))

Reply (to Non-Oppositon to defs Motion to Compel) filed.

Reply (to Non-Oppositon to defs Motion to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Sutter Health(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer submitted by Sutter Memorial Hospital rejected on 11/29/2016 . (Filed By: Sutter Memorial Hospital(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/23/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/13/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Peace, Belma(Plaintiff); Peace, Charles(Plaintiff); The Estate of Frederick Peace(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less