Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/05/2017 at 00:37:39 (UTC).

BARBARA J BALLIET. ET AL VS. PAC PACIFIC PROPERTIES. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2007 BARBARA J BALLIET filed an Other lawsuit against PAC PACIFIC PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2535

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Brenda

Ehsan, Shafi

Brown Jr, Albert

Cheung, Tony

Thompson, Scott

Martinez, Rosalie

Nekmal, Hosai

Bishop, Sondra R.

Bassia, Abdul F.

Ribeiro, Stephanie

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Shasta Real Estate Company

Cross Defendants

Techtron Products inc

Shasta Real Estate Company

Countertop Specialists, Inc

Formost Superior Marble Co Inc

Magdaleno Martin Inc

Vaca Valley Roofing Inc

Cornerstone Security Systems

Carter B Jones Cement Contractor Incorporated

Moes 501-600

Not Classified By Court and Special Master

Dekker, Peter H.

85 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Paul B Walsh

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Susan F Leonard

Patricia A Sisemore

John E Riddle

Marissa N Acree

Other Attorneys

William A Jenkins

Brigitte M Mayo

Laura D Cason

Larry D. Letofsky

Jeremie J Wattellier

Susan H Rapp

Lynn E Evans-Bonzell

Keith R Pawloski

Kenneth D Harris

I Hooshie Broomand

Jordan A Rodman

Joel Witzman

Alexander R Moore

David M Levy

Quyen H Khuong

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/24/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/24/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/04/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/04/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/04/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/04/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Returned DOcument(This case is deemed complex, a fee of $550.00 is needed.)issued 07/17/2008

Returned DOcument(This case is deemed complex, a fee of $550.00 is needed.)issued 07/17/2008

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Amethyst Homes Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Amended Cross-Complaint filed.

Amended Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: PAC Pacific Properties LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Shasta Real Estate Company(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Lexington Insurance Company(Intervenor))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Amethyst Homes Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: ER Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Holmes-Hally Industries(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Sierra Wes Drywall Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Wayne-Dalton Corp.(Cross - Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: ER Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: PAC Pacific Properties LLC(Cross - Complainant))

487 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 13; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
709 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2007
  • Johnson, Steve added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Johnson, Connie added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Gillespie, Cathy added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Faupell, Candi L added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Chow, Simon added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Brown, Albert Jr added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Bishop, Sondra R added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Bassia, Nazifa added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Bassia, Abdul F added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • Balliet, Barbara J added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Techtron Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vaca Valley Roffing Inc is a litigant