Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:28:40 (UTC).

Anthony Granado vs. Western Pacific Housing Inc. a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/20/2011 Anthony Granado filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Western Pacific Housing Inc a California Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1092

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abriam, Zemaoda

Cortez, Carmen

Yabut, Michelle

Dhillon, Hartirat

Granado, Anthony

Carrillo, Raul

Yount, Lois

Witkin, Robert

Defendants

Western Pacific Housing-East Park LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Western Pacific Housing, Inc., A Delaware Corporation

Lamco Housing Inc, a California Corporation

Western Pacific, Inc., A Delaware Coporation, Formerly Known As Schuler Homes Holdco, Inc., Successor By Merger With Western Pacific Housing-East Park, LLC

Western Pacific Housing Inc, a Delaware Corporation

Cross Defendants

Peninsula Floors

Thomas Lighting Company Inc

Thompson Electric

B&B Construction

Coastal Construction & Lumber

California Mantel

Groundworks Inc

172 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Jackson

Defendant Attorney

Eric R Hiller

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Marshall K Jaquish

Carlos C Cabral

Other Attorneys

Larry D. Letofsky

Ryan J Cronin-Prather

Robert D Lockhart

Lynn E Evans-Bonzell

Julie R Ursic

Paul B Walsh

Stacy Melville Moak

Jon A Van Woerkom

Todd D Bromgard

Ross R Nott

David S Park

Brian C Chien

John Van De Poel, Jr

Alison F Wessel

Robin L Krutzsch

Justin J McKenna

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 06/15/2017 11:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 06/15/2017 11:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 06/28/2018 09:15:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 06/28/2018 09:15:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/01/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/01/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 12/18/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 12/18/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/14/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/14/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 03/10/2017 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 03/10/2017 01:30:00 PM published .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Liberty Bell Alarm Company Inc(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Western Pacific Housing Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Western Pacific Housing Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (to Cross Complaint of Western Pacific Housing) filed.

Answer (to Cross Complaint of Western Pacific Housing) filed. (Filed By: Techtron Products(Cross - Defendant))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Staying Action) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Staying Action) filed. (Filed By: Western Pacific Housing, Inc., A California Corporation(Defendant))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Western Pacific Housing East Park LLC(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order #1 Re Trial Setting) filed.

Order - Other (Order #1 Re Trial Setting) filed.

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 05/20/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 05/20/2016 02:00:00 PM .

568 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:15 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:00 PM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
955 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Ahluwalia, Hardip(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Ahmad(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Farid(Plaintiff); Aminy, Mohd(Plaintiff); Bragg, Lavaughn(Plaintiff); Bragg, Ray(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Lorena(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Raul(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Hartirat(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Nirmal(Plaintiff); Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Susanne(Plaintiff); Judge, Kamaljil(Plaintiff); Judge, Surinder(Plaintiff); Loforte, Denice(Plaintiff); Loforte, Vincent(Plaintiff); McKenna, Edna(Plaintiff); McKenna, Helen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/12/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (1st Amended) filed. (Filed By: Ahluwalia, Hardip(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Ahmad(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Farid(Plaintiff); Aminy, Mohd(Plaintiff); Bragg, Lavaughn(Plaintiff); Bragg, Ray(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Lorena(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Raul(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Hartirat(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Nirmal(Plaintiff); Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Susanne(Plaintiff); Judge, Kamaljil(Plaintiff); Judge, Surinder(Plaintiff); Loforte, Denice(Plaintiff); Loforte, Vincent(Plaintiff); McKenna, Edna(Plaintiff); McKenna, Helen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1st amended) filed. (Filed By: Ahluwalia, Hardip(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Ahmad(Plaintiff); Ahmadi, Farid(Plaintiff); Aminy, Mohd(Plaintiff); Bragg, Lavaughn(Plaintiff); Bragg, Ray(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Lorena(Plaintiff); Carrillo, Raul(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Hartirat(Plaintiff); Dhillon, Nirmal(Plaintiff); Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hutchison, Susanne(Plaintiff); Judge, Kamaljil(Plaintiff); Judge, Surinder(Plaintiff); Loforte, Denice(Plaintiff); Loforte, Vincent(Plaintiff); McKenna, Edna(Plaintiff); McKenna, Helen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/20/2011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Granado, Anthony(Plaintiff); Granado, Cristina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Thomas Lighting Company, Inc., A California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PENINSULA FLOORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LAMCO HOUSING INC A CAL CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Pacific Housing-East Park, LLC is a litigant