This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/22/2017 at 05:29:24 (UTC).

Angela Holland vs. Bryan College

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 Angela Holland filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bryan College. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6446

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holland, Angela

Defendants

Does 1-5

Bryan College

Alta Education LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

Defendant Attorney

Courtney L Baird

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/22/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/22/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 12/22/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 12/22/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Petition to compel arb, stay action memo of p&A) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Petition to compel arb, stay action memo of p&A) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of John Ledesma) filed.

Declaration - Other (of John Ledesma) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Courtney L Baird) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Courtney L Baird) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Correspondence (Confirming Letter Continuing Hearing Date of 3/30/2017 at 9:00 a.m. D54 (GRANTED)) filed.

Correspondence (Confirming Letter Continuing Hearing Date of 3/30/2017 at 9:00 a.m. D54 (GRANTED)) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Notice - Other (of Non Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed.

Notice - Other (of Non Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

Reply (to plfs Non-Opp to Petition to Compel Arb and Dismiss) filed.

Reply (to plfs Non-Opp to Petition to Compel Arb and Dismiss) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Reply (to Non-Opposition to Petition to Compel Arb) filed.

Reply (to Non-Opposition to Petition to Compel Arb) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

Proof of Service (Amended) filed.

Proof of Service (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/19/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply (to Non-Opposition to Petition to Compel Arb) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply (to plfs Non-Opp to Petition to Compel Arb and Dismiss) filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Non Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition to Compel Arbitration - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/30/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/22/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Alta Education LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/24/2016 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Holland, Angela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less