Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 12:02:14 (UTC).

ANDRIA BROWN. ET AL VS. NEW FAZE DEVELOPMENT. INC.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2004 ANDRIA BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW FAZE DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3808

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Khong, Phat

Mondragon, Lydia

Gaines, Ronald

Hernandez, Enrique

Hayes, Felicia

Thames, Gwendolyn

Brown, Andria

Defendants

H & D Electric Inc

Beutler Corporation

Horizon Development & Construction

Dennis Blazona Construction Inc

Trecek, Richard

Cross Defendants

Home Finishes

Masco Contractors Services Central Inc

A-1 Masonry Construction

Yard Furnishers Inc

Crosswhite Inc

Ron Sandhal Earth Moving Inc

Classic Cabinets

Homebuilders Service Company

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glen A Van Dyke

Defendant Attorney

Todd A Jones

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Gregory A Bastian

Joseph R Wheeler

Anne E Connelly

Other Attorneys

Brigitte M Mayo

Thomas D Nielsen

Grant C Woodruff

Susan F Leonard

Rebecca L Bach

Grant R Mullen

Elizabeth W Lawley

Stephen K Anderson

Randi L Fujimoto

Karen L Jacobsen

David M Levy

Carlos V Yguico

Deborah A Correll

Scott D Cote

Roberta E Nalbandian

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 11/27/2007 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 11/27/2007 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 11/27/2007 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion heard on 11/27/2007 09:30:00 AM .

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Mullen, Grant(Attorney))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Association of Attorney submitted by Perfect Service Builders Inc rejected on 04/09/2009 .

Association of Attorney submitted by Perfect Service Builders Inc rejected on 04/09/2009 . (Filed By: Perfect Service Builders Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING submitted by Home Finishes rejected on 11/25/2009 .

Proof of Service - MAILING submitted by Home Finishes rejected on 11/25/2009 . (Filed By: Home Finishes(Cross - Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2007
  • H & D Electric Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Foremost Superior Marble Company Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Excel Landscape added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Dennis Blazona Construction Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Ikes Landscaping Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Sacramento Insulation Contractors added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Carmichael Door Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Beutler Corporation added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: A-1 Masonry Construction(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • A-1 Masonry Construction added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/15/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crosswhite Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Home Finishes is a litigant

Latest cases where Ron Sandhal Earth Moving Inc is a litigant