This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:50:07 (UTC).

Andrey Moskalenko vs. Dr Horton Sacramento Inc

Case Summary

On 07/09/2014 Andrey Moskalenko filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Dr Horton Sacramento Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6050

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alvardo, Richard

Band, Fu

Basi, Jadeep

Basi, Mandeep

Bemis, Jessica

Bouley, Jeremy

Bouley, Lynette

Bravo, Erick

Brecht, Antoinette

Brecht, David

Bui, Daniel

Dain, Teresa

Dorantes, Daniel

Ferhut, Sarah

Ford, Myesha

Glover, Sheila

Hampton, Mary Anne

Harrell, Horace

Hernando and Sandy Orozco Trustees

Herrera, Carmen

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luke P Ryan

Other Attorneys

Eric R Hiller

James R Donahue

Stephen B. Welch

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 11/29/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 11/29/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 07/17/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 07/17/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 10/23/2015 10:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 10/23/2015 10:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: D R Horton Inc - Sacramento(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Appearance filed.

Notice of Appearance filed. (Filed By: Carmichael Door Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: D R Horton Inc Sacramento(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/29/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/29/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff))

Report - Other (Status Report in Advance of OSC) filed.

Report - Other (Status Report in Advance of OSC) filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff); Moskalenko, Svetlana(Plaintiff))

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion to Compel) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint for Damages) filed.

Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint for Damages) filed. (Filed By: Alvardo, Richard(Plaintiff); Band, Fu(Plaintiff); Basi, Jadeep(Plaintiff); Basi, Mandeep(Plaintiff); Bemis, Jessica(Plaintiff); Bouley, Jeremy(Plaintiff); Bouley, Lynette(Plaintiff); Bravo, Erick(Plaintiff); Brecht, Antoinette(Plaintiff); Brecht, David(Plaintiff); Bui, Daniel(Plaintiff); Dain, Teresa(Plaintiff); Dorantes, Daniel(Plaintiff); Ferhut, Sarah(Plaintiff); Ford, Myesha(Plaintiff); Glover, Sheila(Plaintiff); Hampton, Mary(Plaintiff); Harrell, Horace(Plaintiff); Hernando and Sandy Orozco Trustees(Plaintiff); Herrera, Carmen(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/22/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/22/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hu, Sam(Plaintiff))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 01/20/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 01/20/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Moskalenko, Andrey(Plaintiff))

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
274 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Notice of Assignment to Department 35 for Complex Case Management Determination) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Alvardo, Richard(Plaintiff); Band, Fu(Plaintiff); Basi, Jadeep(Plaintiff); Basi, Mandeep(Plaintiff); Bemis, Jessica(Plaintiff); Bouley, Jeremy(Plaintiff); Bouley, Lynette(Plaintiff); Bravo, Erick(Plaintiff); Brecht, Antoinette(Plaintiff); Brecht, David(Plaintiff); Bui, Daniel(Plaintiff); Dain, Teresa(Plaintiff); Dorantes, Daniel(Plaintiff); Ferhut, Sarah(Plaintiff); Ford, Myesha(Plaintiff); Glover, Sheila(Plaintiff); Hampton, Mary(Plaintiff); Harrell, Horace(Plaintiff); Hernando and Sandy Orozco Trustees(Plaintiff); Herrera, Carmen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Designated a complex action on 07/09/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Designated as an exceptional action on 07/09/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Designated class action on 07/09/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/09/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Alvardo, Richard(Plaintiff); Band, Fu(Plaintiff); Basi, Jadeep(Plaintiff); Basi, Mandeep(Plaintiff); Bemis, Jessica(Plaintiff); Bouley, Jeremy(Plaintiff); Bouley, Lynette(Plaintiff); Bravo, Erick(Plaintiff); Brecht, Antoinette(Plaintiff); Brecht, David(Plaintiff); Bui, Daniel(Plaintiff); Dain, Teresa(Plaintiff); Dorantes, Daniel(Plaintiff); Ferhut, Sarah(Plaintiff); Ford, Myesha(Plaintiff); Glover, Sheila(Plaintiff); Hampton, Mary(Plaintiff); Harrell, Horace(Plaintiff); Hernando and Sandy Orozco Trustees(Plaintiff); Herrera, Carmen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Alvardo, Richard(Plaintiff); Band, Fu(Plaintiff); Basi, Jadeep(Plaintiff); Basi, Mandeep(Plaintiff); Bemis, Jessica(Plaintiff); Bouley, Jeremy(Plaintiff); Bouley, Lynette(Plaintiff); Bravo, Erick(Plaintiff); Brecht, Antoinette(Plaintiff); Brecht, David(Plaintiff); Bui, Daniel(Plaintiff); Dain, Teresa(Plaintiff); Dorantes, Daniel(Plaintiff); Ferhut, Sarah(Plaintiff); Ford, Myesha(Plaintiff); Glover, Sheila(Plaintiff); Hampton, Mary(Plaintiff); Harrell, Horace(Plaintiff); Hernando and Sandy Orozco Trustees(Plaintiff); Herrera, Carmen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less