Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 21:57:37 (UTC).

Amir Rahimi vs. State of California Board of Equalization

Case Summary

On 07/10/2014 Amir Rahimi filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of California Board of Equalization. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6116

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rahimi, Amir

Defendants

Does 1-20

State of California Board of Equalization

Tompkins, Mary

Interested Party

Bell, Wendy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William F Wright

Defendant Attorney

Tamara L Morgan

Interested Party Attorney

James S Lazar

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/21/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/21/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Reply (to Late-Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Out Portions of Complaint) filed.

Reply (to Late-Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Out Portions of Complaint) filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

Answer submitted by Tompkins, Mary; State of California Board of Equalization rejected on 11/17/2014 .

Answer submitted by Tompkins, Mary; State of California Board of Equalization rejected on 11/17/2014 . (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of William F Wright) filed.

Declaration - Other (of William F Wright) filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of MSJ, or in the alternative) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of MSJ, or in the alternative) filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

Reply (Brief in Support of Motion for Release of Redacted Copies) filed.

Reply (Brief in Support of Motion for Release of Redacted Copies) filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

Motion to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed.

Motion to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

Motion for Attorney Fees filed.

Motion for Attorney Fees filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant); Tompkins, Mary(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Morgan, Tamara L added as a effective 08/22/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: State of California Board of Equalization(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/11/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rahimi, Amir(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less