This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/11/2017 at 00:20:02 (UTC).

Alonzo M Curry vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 01/07/2013 Alonzo M Curry filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8030

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CURRY, ALONZO M

Curry, Alonzo M.

Defendant

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

James C Phillips

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM .

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Response (Request for Dismissal) filed.

Response (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Reply to Opposition filed.

Reply to Opposition filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

Notice of Hearing generated .

Notice of Hearing generated .

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Order - Other (Order on Motion for Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed.

Order - Other (Order on Motion for Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed.

Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing Sustaining Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing Sustaining Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 05/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing Sustaining Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order on Motion for Demurrer Without Leave to Amend) filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Curry, Alonzo M Application for Waiver granted in full on 02/01/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/01/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Curry, Alonzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less