This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/11/2017 at 16:00:40 (UTC).

Alicia Clark vs. Arthur Caitling

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 Alicia Clark filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arthur Caitling. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1029

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, ALICIA

Defendants

CAITLING, ARTHUR

GREEN DESERT OIL GROUP INC

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie A Doumit

Defendant Attorney

Robert W Thompson

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Caitling, Arthur(Defendant); Green Desert Oil Group Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Caitling, Arthur(Defendant); Green Desert Oil Group Inc(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 08:30am was vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Caitling, Arthur(Defendant); Green Desert Oil Group Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Caitling, Arthur(Defendant); Green Desert Oil Group Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Thompson, Robert W added as a effective 05/17/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/28/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Clark, Alicia(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less