This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 07:03:48 (UTC).

Akbar Afshinnik vs. Signature Homes Inc

Case Summary

On 05/13/2013 Akbar Afshinnik filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Signature Homes Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4865

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFSHINNIK, AKBAR

KHAKIZADEH, MAHIN

Defendant

SIGNATURE HOMES INC

Cross Defendants

Exclusive Exteriors Inc.

Warda, Yousif Tony

Warda, George Tony

Performance Design Inc.

Medallion Idustries Inc.

American Engineering Contractors Inc.

Warda Glass

Sierra Wes Wall Systems Inc.

Petersen-DeanInc.

Campbell Concrete of California Inc.

Left Coast Builders Inc.

Air Design Inc.

Roes 1-350

Custom Masonry by Curt Neice Inc.

Sierra Wes Drywall Inc

Anderson Window Enterprises

Kenyon Plastering Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teresa A. Libertino

Defendant Attorney

James L McCormick

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Todd D Bromgard

Patricia A Sisemore

Eileen T Booth

David A Harris

Adrienne D Cohen

Paul B Walsh

Other Attorneys

Robert P Hamilton

Todd A Fischer

Brian H Gunn

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Signature Homes Inc(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 1) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 1) filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Signature Homes Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Signature Homes Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/23/2014 08:30:00 AM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Defendant))

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to File Amended Answer - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal submitted by Signature Properties Inc rejected on 05/13/2016 . (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal submitted by Signature Properties Inc rejected on 05/13/2016 . (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Signature Properties Inc rejected on 03/21/2016 . (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Signature Properties Inc rejected on 03/21/2016 . (Filed By: Signature Properties Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/07/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Afshinnik, Akbar(Plaintiff); Khakizadeh, Mahin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPBELL CONCRETE OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Air Design Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Wes Drywall, Inc. is a litigant