This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 09:44:59 (UTC).

ZUEHLKE vs GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 ZUEHLKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0470

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PETER ZUEHLKE

NADEZHDA ZUEHLKE

Defendants

GAIL ROBSON

STEVE M GUTIERREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Lars Larson

Defendant Attorney

Kinkle, Rodiger and Spriggs

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension pursuant to CCP 430.41 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/30/2021: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension pursuant to CCP 430.41 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/23/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Certificate of Mailing

09/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Ruling on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/20/2021: Notice of Ruling on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Case Management Statement

09/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/20/2021: Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/20/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Strike Punitive Damages

09/16/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Strike Punitive Damages

Reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to strike

09/09/2021: Reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to strike

Opposition to Motion to Strike on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

09/02/2021: Opposition to Motion to Strike on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

08/27/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Motion to Strike Punitive Damages on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

08/18/2021: Motion to Strike Punitive Damages on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

Certificate of Mailing

07/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/30/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to strike punitive damages

08/02/2021: Minute Order: Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to strike punitive damages

1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

07/21/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210930-00411.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension pursuant to CCP 430.41 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE; NADEZHDA ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE; NADEZHDA ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE; NADEZHDA ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8686 Receipt No.: 20210921-01074.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/24/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6003 Receipt No.: 20210624-00645.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to strike punitive damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PETER ZUEHLKE; Filed By: STEVE M GUTIERREZ; GAIL ROBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice Regarding Punitive Damages; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/05/2021; Fine Description: Check #271446 Receipt No.: 20210205-00330.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: PETER ZUEHLKE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON CHARLES L.