This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/24/2022 at 00:30:24 (UTC).

ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO vs RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1109

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO

Defendants

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

ALTA VISTA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID D. BIBIYAN JEFFREY D. KLEIN SARA A. KEANE

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

03/18/2022: Class Action Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

03/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

03/18/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/18/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

03/23/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2022

HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220323-01423.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220323-01423.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220323-01423.1; Paid: $1,000.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 05/17/2022; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Class Action Complaint; Filed By: JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSE A. ZUBIETA BUENROSTRO, AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less