This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 12:04:23 (UTC).

ZAMORA HERNANDEZ vs EDELBROCK FOUNDRY LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 ZAMORA HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EDELBROCK FOUNDRY LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3870

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

Defendant

EDELBROCK FOUNDRY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farris Elias Ain

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

08/25/2021: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/25/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/25/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/25/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

09/01/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Minute Order: Hearing re: Court Filing Fees - Counsel Advancing Litigation Costs

09/09/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Court Filing Fees - Counsel Advancing Litigation Costs

Notice of Document Return.

10/20/2021: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (FW-008) - Denied; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Court Filing Fees - Counsel Advancing Litigation Costs; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Awaiting Payment : TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Expiration Date: 11/12/2021; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Court Filing Fees - Counsel Advancing Litigation Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/25/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20210825-00546.1; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/28/2021; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: REQUEST_DENIED, Fee Waiver Request Denied Receipt No.: 20210825-00546.2; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ; Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver; Filed By: TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ; Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of TERESA ZAMORA HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIN FARRIS ELIAS