This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 11:52:30 (UTC).

YOUNKER vs GENERAL MOTORS, LLC,

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 YOUNKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4656

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LESLIE A. YOUNKER

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEAL F. MORROW, III

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/15/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

07/15/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/15/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/18/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

07/18/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of LESLIE A. YOUNKER

07/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of LESLIE A. YOUNKER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220718-01413.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220718-01413.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 09/13/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of LESLIE A. YOUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORROW NEAL F.