This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 03:16:03 (UTC).

WYNINEGAR vs PEDOTA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 WYNINEGAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEDOTA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson Lucky and Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0604

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jackson Lucky

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN WYNINEGAR

Defendant

JACK PEDOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Harris Gilbert

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

02/05/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

02/05/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/05/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

02/05/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

02/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

07/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: JOHN WYNINEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/11/2021; Fine Description: Check #12571 Receipt No.: 20210211-02435.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOHN WYNINEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOHN WYNINEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOHN WYNINEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: JOHN WYNINEGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN WYNINEGAR; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Harris Gilbert