This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2021 at 04:55:18 (UTC).

WINBUSH vs CAL LIFT, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 WINBUSH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAL LIFT, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3211

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY WINBUSH

Defendants

CAL LIFT, INC

LUIS TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN HATCH

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG ALAN ROEB

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/16/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

07/16/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/16/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice Re Demand for Jury Trial and Posting of Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH

09/08/2021: Notice Re Demand for Jury Trial and Posting of Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH

Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH

09/08/2021: Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/10/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210910-00160.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/10/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210910-00160.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/10/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210910-00160.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH; Filed By: CAL LIFT, INC.; LUIS TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice Re Demand for Jury Trial and Posting of Fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH; Filed By: CAL LIFT, INC.; LUIS TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/19/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210719-00190.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TIMOTHY WINBUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TIMOTHY WINBUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TIMOTHY WINBUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: TIMOTHY WINBUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of TIMOTHY WINBUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL LIFT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEB CRAIG A. ESQ.