This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 22:43:32 (UTC).

WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION vs BOTTOMLEY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BOTTOMLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3638

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Defendants

ZIONS BANCORPORATION, NA

RICHARD A BOTTOMLEY

SUSAN G BOTTOMLEY

TRUSTEES OF THE BOTTOMLEY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 30, 2019

CA BANK & TRUST

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL KNIGHTEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

09/14/2022: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/14/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

09/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/15/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220915-01262.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220915-01262.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/13/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of WHITLEY'S CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZB, N. A., a National banking association is a litigant