This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 08:45:10 (UTC).

WHITLEY vs COWAN

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 WHITLEY filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against COWAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristi Hester. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0724

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kristi Hester

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Not Yet Classified and Others

JEFFREY COWAN

DEP BRYAN WHITLEY

Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court

DEP BRYAN WHITLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court Attorney

OFFICE OF COUNTY COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Response to Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders (WV-120) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; Filed By: JEFFREY COWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Personal Service on Restraining Order After Hearing served on 04/26/2021 on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; DEP BRYAN WHITLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Kristi Hester; Location/Courtroom: Department 2E; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Minute Order: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing (WV-130)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service re: WV116 Order on Request to Continue to 4/13/2021 on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Kristi Hester; Location/Courtroom: Department 2E; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Temporary Restraining Order (Workplace Violence Prevention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence Prevention (WV-109) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001); Filed By: RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders (WV-100); Filed By: RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; Disposition: Court Finding 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant