This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:43:20 (UTC).

WHITFIELD vs DOE GROUP HOME EMPLOYEES 1-10

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 WHITFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE GROUP HOME EMPLOYEES 1-10. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0095

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY WHITFIELD

Defendants

SEAN PEREZ

DAN DESIMONE

DEBORAH DESIMONE

TEMECULA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

LAKE ELSINORE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

PATTI BILLINGSLEY

DOE DPSS WORKERS 1-5

DOE DPSS SUPERVISORS 1-5

DOE DPSS PLACEMENT WORKERS 1-5

DOE DPSS PLACEMENT SUPERVISORS 1-5

DOE FOSTER FAMILY AGENCIES 1-5

DOE FFA EMPLOYEES 1-5

DOE GROUP HOMES 1-10

DOE GROUP HOME EMPLOYEES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAWN MCMILLAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

01/06/2023: Complaint for Damages

Certificate of Counsel.

01/06/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/10/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230110-00349.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230110-00349.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/07/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KIMBERLY WHITFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KIMBERLY WHITFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: KIMBERLY WHITFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of KIMBERLY WHITFIELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less