This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/22/2022 at 11:19:54 (UTC).

WHITEHEAD vs THE LUNADA BAY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 WHITEHEAD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE LUNADA BAY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7007

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOURDAN WHITEHEAD

Defendant

THE LUNADA BAY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY A HALL

 

Court Documents

Complaint For Damages

10/17/2022: Complaint For Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

10/17/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

10/21/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

10/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221021-00833.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221021-00833.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/16/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOURDAN WHITEHEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOURDAN WHITEHEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint For Damages; Filed By: JOURDAN WHITEHEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOURDAN WHITEHEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL TIMOTHY A