This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 14:59:54 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION vs SCHILLING, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCHILLING, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0370

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

Defendants

JAMES SCHILLING, AN INDIVIDUAL

N&J, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMIRA REZAEI HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

01/26/2023: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

Summons Issued and Filed

01/26/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/26/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Department Assignment

01/27/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH

01/27/2023: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230127-01870.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230127-01870.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/27/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000; Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less