This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 02:17:13 (UTC).

WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC. vs SCHOLTE PLUMBING, CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCHOLTE PLUMBING, CO , INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2273

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC

Defendants

SCHOLTE PLUMBING, CO., INC

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

F. ALBERT IBRAHIM

 

Court Documents

Complaint for: 1. Breach of Contract

06/06/2022: Complaint for: 1. Breach of Contract

Summons Issued and Filed

06/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/06/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

06/07/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

06/07/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

06/09/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

06/13/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/14/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220614-00122.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/09/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220609-01214.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220607-00693.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220607-00693.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for: 1. Breach of Contract; Filed By: WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WESTERN STATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN STATE CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IBRAHIM, F. ALBERT