This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 00:44:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs CO

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4121

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MARCELO CO

INT'L MERCHANDISING CO OF CA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YVONNE RAMIREZ-BROWNING

 

Court Documents

Verified Complaint for Money

09/09/2021: Verified Complaint for Money

Certificate of Counsel.

09/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

09/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/10/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

10/08/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/10/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210910-00583.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint for Money; Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less