This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 10:18:09 (UTC).

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BEST BUY STORES, L P. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2727

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BEST BUY STORES, L.P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Paul Williams

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

06/15/2021: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

06/17/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Department Assignment

06/17/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

08/16/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Request for Dismissal

08/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

08/23/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2170 Receipt No.: 20210617-00581.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JASON P