This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 03:13:31 (UTC).

WASHINGTON vs FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 WASHINGTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad Firetag and Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5024

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chad Firetag

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTNEY WASHINGTON

Defendants

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE, LLC

VILLA MIRAGE APARTMENTS

FPI MANAGEMENT, INC

CALIFORNIA HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dani Mouri

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/20/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/20/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Demand for Jury Trial

09/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Department Assignment

09/29/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration for Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6; Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6115 Receipt No.: 20211013-00751.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6115 Receipt No.: 20210929-00881.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6115 Receipt No.: 20210929-00881.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/19/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial; Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of COURTNEY WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOUSINGFINANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant