This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 23:35:08 (UTC).

WASHINGTON vs AUTO REMARKETING GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 WASHINGTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AUTO REMARKETING GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5456

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARNELL WASHINGTON

Defendants

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC

AUTO REMARKETING GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASRA SADR

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

10/01/2021: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

10/01/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

10/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

10/06/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of DARNELL WASHINGTON

10/06/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of DARNELL WASHINGTON

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211006-00734.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/30/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of DARNELL WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO REMARKETING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant