This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 20:59:42 (UTC).

WARREN vs BHAJHANI

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 WARREN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BHAJHANI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4515

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDEN WARREN

SANDRA FUENTES

Defendants

IMAN BHAJHANI

DOORDASH INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Alexander Percy

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

10/01/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/01/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

10/01/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

10/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

10/05/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/05/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BRANDEN WARREN

10/12/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BRANDEN WARREN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BRANDEN WARREN; Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20211005-00702.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20211005-00702.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/30/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN; SANDRA FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN; SANDRA FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN; SANDRA FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN; SANDRA FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial; Filed By: BRANDEN WARREN; SANDRA FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BRANDEN WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Doordash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERCY WILLIAM A.