This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 21:03:05 (UTC).

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC vs PHARES

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHARES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3662

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

Defendant

JANET PHARES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WENDY LOCKE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

06/07/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/07/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

06/07/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/20/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

06/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

06/20/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/20/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220620-00408.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/20/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220620-00408.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 08/06/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, WENDY